ME LD339 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Provide Electronic Access to Confidential Juror Information

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Provide Electronic Access to Confidential Juror Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2023-04-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-18HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-04-18HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2023-04-13SenateOrdered sent down forthwith
2023-04-13SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2023-04-13SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2023-04-12SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2023-04-12SenateREAD ONCE
2023-04-12SenateOn motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2023-04-12SenateReports Read
2023-04-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2023-04-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2023-04-11HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2023-04-11HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-04-11HouseReports READ.
2023-04-07JointReported Out: OTP/ONTP
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-15JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-03-15JointWork Session Held
2023-01-31SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2023-01-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-01-31HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2023-01-31HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback