ME LD337 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding the Powers of the Efficiency Maine Trust and the Maine Clean Energy and Sustainability Accelerator

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding the Powers of the Efficiency Maine Trust and the Maine Clean Energy and Sustainability Accelerator

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-11SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2022-04-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2022-04-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2022-04-05HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2022-04-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-507).
2022-04-05HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2022-04-05HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2022-04-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2022-04-05SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-507).
2022-04-05SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-507) READ and ADOPTED.
2022-04-05SenateREAD ONCE.
2022-04-05SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2022-04-04JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2022-03-16JointVoted: OTP-AM
2022-03-16JointWork Session Held
2021-07-19SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
2021-06-10JointCarry Over Approved
2021-05-21JointCarry Over Requested
2021-05-21JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-02-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on February 4, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback