ME LD336 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 313: Net Energy Billing Rule To Allow Shared Ownership, a Major Substantive Rule of the Public Utilities Commission
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 313: Net Energy Billing Rule To Allow Shared Ownership, a Major Substantive Rule of the Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) in concurrence | |
2009-04-16 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-15 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) | |
2009-04-14 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Hobbins of York REFERRED to the Committee on UTILITIES AND ENERGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218 in concurrence | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |