ME LD328 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Encourage Regional Planning and Reorganization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Encourage Regional Planning and Reorganization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-23SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-10-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-10-23HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-10-23HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-10-23HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-150) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-344) thereto.
2017-10-23SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-10-23SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-150) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-344) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-10-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-150) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-344) thereto ADOPTED
2017-10-23SenateOn motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-344) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-150) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-10-23SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-150)
2017-10-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby The Bill was PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-10-23SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-05-23SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-05-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-18HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-150) in concurrence
2017-05-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-150) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
2017-05-16SenateREAD ONCE
2017-05-16SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2017-05-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-150).
2017-05-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-05-11HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-01-31SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
2017-01-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-31HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
2017-01-31HouseCommittee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback