ME LD328 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Personal Representatives of Children Access to Certain Documents of the Department of Health and Human Services Regarding Child Protective Activities
Title
An Act To Allow Personal Representatives of Children Access to Certain Documents of the Department of Health and Human Services Regarding Child Protective Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-01 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-202), in concurrence. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-202) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-202) |
2015-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2015-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-26 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-02-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-02-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-02-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-02-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-02-10 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |