ME LD325 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide Emergency Funds for Clients of the Adult Protective Services System

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide Emergency Funds for Clients of the Adult Protective Services System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-07SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-30SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-140) in concurrence
2019-04-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-140) READ and ADOPTED
2019-04-30SenateREAD ONCE
2019-04-30SenateOn motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2019-04-30SenateReports Read
2019-04-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-25HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-140).
2019-04-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-04-25HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-140) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-04-25HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-04-25HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-04-25HouseReports READ.
2019-01-24SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2019-01-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-24HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2019-01-24HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback