ME LD315 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 500 Yeas 19 - Nays 3 - Excused 13 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Provide Funding for Programs Benefiting Maine Farmers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Provide Funding for Programs Benefiting Maine Farmers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-07-25 - Senate - Enactment RC #500 (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-07-25 - Senate - Adopt Senate Amendment (s-446) To Committee Amendment RC #492 (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-26SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 500 Yeas 19 - Nays 3 - Excused 13 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2023-07-26SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-07-25HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-07-25HouseSubsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-446) thereto.
2023-07-25HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2023-07-25HouseLater today assigned.
2023-07-25HouseOn motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending the motion of Speaker TALBOT ROSS of Portland to RECEDE and CONCUR to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-446) thereto.
2023-07-25SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2023-07-25SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-446) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2023-07-25SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-27) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-446) thereto ADOPTED
2023-07-25SenateSenate Amendment "A" (S-446) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) ADOPTED
2023-07-25SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 492 Yeas 22 - Nays 4 - Excused 9 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2023-07-25SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-446) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) READ
2023-07-25SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) was ADOPTED
2023-07-25SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-27)
2023-07-25SenateOn Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2023-07-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-07-25HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-05-02SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2023-04-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-27HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-04-27HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2023-04-25HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-25HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-27).
2023-04-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2023-04-25HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2023-04-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2023-04-20SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-27)
2023-04-20SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2023-04-18SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2023-04-18SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-27) READ and ADOPTED
2023-04-18SenateREAD ONCE
2023-04-18SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2023-04-13JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-01JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-03-01JointWork Session Held
2023-01-31HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-01-31HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2023-01-31SenateCommittee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=315&snum=131
Texthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0136&item=1&snum=131
Texthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0136&item=5&snum=131
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0136&item=2&snum=131
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0136&item=4&snum=131
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_131st/fiscalpdfs/FN031502.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_131st/fiscalpdfs/FN031504.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_131st/fiscalpdfs/FN031505.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280085551&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=492
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280085551&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=500

Bill Comments

feedback