ME LD279 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Raise Juror Pay to $50 per Day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Raise Juror Pay to $50 per Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #34 (Y: 81 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-04-16SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-11HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-04HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-04HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-24).
2019-04-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-04-04HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-24) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-04-04HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-04-04HouseROLL CALL NO. 34 (Yeas 82 - Nays 56 - Absent 11 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-04-04HouseOn motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-04-04HouseReports READ.
2019-04-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-04-02SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-24)
2019-04-02SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2019-03-28SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-24) READ and ADOPTED
2019-03-28SenateREAD ONCE
2019-03-28SenateOn motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (S-24) Report ACCEPTED.
2019-03-28SenateReports Read
2019-01-22HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2019-01-22SenateCommittee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback