ME LD269 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Designate Granitic Pegmatite as the Maine State Rock
Title
An Act to Designate Granitic Pegmatite as the Maine State Rock
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Rep. John Andrews [R] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Rachel Henderson [R] |
Rep. Adam Lee [D] | Rep. Sawin Millett [R] | Rep. Walter Riseman [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-03-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-03-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-03-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-03-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2023-02-16 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2023-02-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |