ME LD268 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Credit under the Commercial Forestry Excise Tax for Landowners Using Businesses Based in the United States
Title
An Act To Create a Credit under the Commercial Forestry Excise Tax for Landowners Using Businesses Based in the United States
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] | Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #393 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subsequently LD 268 In Senate, February 6, 2020, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after consideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 19 and 11, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2019-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-277) thereto. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-277) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-277) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-13 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-277) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-218). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-218). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |