ME LD268 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restrict Cash Access for Electronic Benefit Transfer Cards
Title
An Act To Restrict Cash Access for Electronic Benefit Transfer Cards
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] |
Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] | Rep. Paula Sutton [R] | Rep. Dustin White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Insist RC #355 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #341 (Y: 78 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #341 (Y: 78 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 355 Yeas 31 - Nays 3 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-479) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-479) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-479) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 341 (Yeas 78 - Nays 69 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 341 (Yeas 78 - Nays 69 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-19 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |