ME LD264 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Board of Pesticides Control To Gather Information Relating to Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances in the State
Title
Resolve, Directing the Board of Pesticides Control To Gather Information Relating to Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances in the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-522) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-522) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-522). |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-522) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REFFERED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY |
2021-03-10 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-10 | House | Representative TUCKER from the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Reports a recommendation for a CHANGE OF COMMITEE. |
2021-03-10 | House | Report of the Chair-Pursuant to Joint Order S.P. 9 |
2021-02-25 | Joint | Reported Out: REFER TO OTHER |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Refer Approved by Chairs/Leads: REFER TO OTHER |
2021-01-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-27 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 27, 2021. |