ME LD258 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Charter of the Southwest Harbor Water and Sewer District
Title
An Act To Amend the Charter of the Southwest Harbor Water and Sewer District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-15), in concurrence. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-15) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-15). |
2017-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2017-03-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |