ME LD257 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Help Ensure That the Legislature Has the Information Necessary To Do the Work of the People of Maine
Title
An Act To Help Ensure That the Legislature Has the Information Necessary To Do the Work of the People of Maine
Sponsors
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Janice Dodge [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Daniel Hobbs [D] |
Rep. Scott Landry [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Walter Riseman [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-76). |
2019-05-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-07 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-01-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |