ME LD255 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Develop a Plan for the Provision of Early Intervention Services
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Develop a Plan for the Provision of Early Intervention Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-07-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-07-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-07-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-01 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-371) thereto. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-371) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-371) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-371) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) was ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-14 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-504). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-504) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-01-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-27 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 27, 2021. |