ME LD253 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen Maine's Election Laws by Requiring Photographic Identification for the Purpose of Voting
Title
An Act To Strengthen Maine's Election Laws by Requiring Photographic Identification for the Purpose of Voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #247 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #162 (Y: 80 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #162 (Y: 80 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 247 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 162 (Yeas 80 - Nays 61 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-01-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-27 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 27, 2021. |