ME LD248 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Board of Occupational Safety and Health
Title
An Act Regarding the Board of Occupational Safety and Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #135 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 135 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-03-30 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 27, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |