ME LD246 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct Funds to the Tourism Marketing Promotion Fund
Title
Resolve, To Direct Funds to the Tourism Marketing Promotion Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] |
Rep. Sawin Millett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-03-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-8). |
2021-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-8). |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-8) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 27, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |