ME LD246 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Secure the Future of the Frances Perkins Homestead
Title
An Act To Secure the Future of the Frances Perkins Homestead
Sponsors
Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Rep. Michael Devin [D] | Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. Victoria Kornfield [D] | Rep. Holly Stover [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #25 (Y: 83 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-15). |
2019-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-15) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-03-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 25 (Yeas 83 - Nays 56 - Absent 10 - Excused 1 Vacant 2) |
2019-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-15) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-15) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-01-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |