ME LD243 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Marijuana Legalization Act to Provide Licensing, Rulemaking and Regulatory and Enforcement Authority within the Department of Administrative and Financial Services; Assign Rulemaking, Regulatory and Enforcement Authority Related to Agricultural Purposes to the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry; and Allocate Funds for Implementation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Marijuana Legalization Act to Provide Licensing, Rulemaking and Regulatory and Enforcement Authority within the Department of Administrative and Financial Services; Assign Rulemaking, Regulatory and Enforcement Authority Related to Agricultural Purposes to the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry; and Allocate Funds for Implementation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2017-06-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-28HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-28HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2017-06-28HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-28HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-312) thereto.
2017-06-28SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-28SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-312) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-221) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-312) thereto ADOPTED
2017-06-28SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-312) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-28SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-221)
2017-06-28SenateOn motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-06-28SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-05-31SenateOn motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
2017-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-30HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2017-05-25SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) in concurrence
2017-05-25SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-221) READ and ADOPTED
2017-05-25SenateREAD ONCE
2017-05-25SenateOn motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-05-25SenateReports Read
2017-05-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-24HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-221).
2017-05-24HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-05-24HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-221) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-24HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-05-24HouseOn motion of Representative PIERCE of Falmouth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-24HouseReports READ.
2017-01-26SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION in concurrence
2017-01-26HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-26HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION.
2017-01-26HouseJoint Select Committee on Marijuana Legalization Implementation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback