ME LD235 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Promote Economic Development in the Fishing Industry by Funding a Dredging Project in Portland Harbor
Title
An Act to Promote Economic Development in the Fishing Industry by Funding a Dredging Project in Portland Harbor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-01-23 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2023-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |