ME LD234 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Increase Certain Chiropractic Reimbursement Rates under the MaineCare Program
Title
Resolve, To Increase Certain Chiropractic Reimbursement Rates under the MaineCare Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-02 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-22), in concurrence. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-22) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2019-03-26 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-21 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-22). |
2019-03-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-22) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-03-21 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-21 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |