ME LD227 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Review the State's Public Health Infrastructure
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Review the State's Public Health Infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2020-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-13 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-667), in concurrence. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-667) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-02-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-667). |
2020-02-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |