ME LD226 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Limit the Use of Hydrofluorocarbons To Fight Climate Change

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Limit the Use of Hydrofluorocarbons To Fight Climate Change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #124 (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-206) in concurrence
2021-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-206) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2021-06-07SenateReports Read
2021-06-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-03HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-206).
2021-06-03HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-03HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-206) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-03HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-03HouseROLL CALL NO. 124 (Yeas 88 - Nays 56 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2021-06-03HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-03HouseReports READ.
2021-06-01JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-04-21JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-04-21JointWork Session Held
2021-04-07JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-24JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-01-25HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-01-25HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on January 25, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback