ME LD221 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 467 Yeas 32 - Nays 2 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Making Unified Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government, General Fund and Other Funds and Changing Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2021, June 30, 2022 and June 30, 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Unified Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government, General Fund and Other Funds and Changing Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2021, June 30, 2022 and June 30, 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #467 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #460 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #406 (Y: 123 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Adopt Cah-735 RC #387 (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Indef Pp Hah-740 To Cah-735 RC #386 (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 467 Yeas 32 - Nays 2 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-30SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2021-06-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 406 (Yeas 123 - Nays 23 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
2021-06-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-30HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2021-06-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 460 Yeas 31 - Nays 3 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-30SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2021-06-30SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-735), in concurrence.
2021-06-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-735) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-30SenateREAD ONCE.
2021-06-30SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-30HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-735).
2021-06-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 387 (Yeas 119 - Nays 25 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2021-06-30HouseSubsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-735) was ADOPTED.
2021-06-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 386 (Yeas 85 - Nays 58 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
2021-06-30HouseOn motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, House Amendment "A" (H-740) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-735) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
2021-06-30HouseOn motion of Representative KESSLER of South Portland, House Amendment "A" (H-740) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-735) was READ.
2021-06-30HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-735) was READ.
2021-06-30HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-30HouseThe Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
2021-06-30HouseOn OBJECTION of Representative KESSLER of South Portland REMOVED.
2021-06-30HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2021-06-29JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2021-06-27JointVoted: OTP-AM
2021-06-27JointWork Session Held
2021-06-25JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-06-23JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-06-21JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-06-11JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-06-09JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-06-01JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-05-28JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-05-14JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-05-13JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-05-06JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-04-15JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-04-08JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-23JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-22JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-18JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-15JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-01-25HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-01-25HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on January 25, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=221&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0156&item=1&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0156&item=7&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0156&item=2&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN022102.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN022107.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078272&chamber=House&serialnumber=386
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078272&chamber=House&serialnumber=387
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078272&chamber=House&serialnumber=406
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078272&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=460
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078272&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=467

Bill Comments 750

feedback