ME LD2207 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Establish Municipal Cost Components for Unorganized Territory Services to Be Rendered in Fiscal Year 2024-25

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Establish Municipal Cost Components for Unorganized Territory Services to Be Rendered in Fiscal Year 2024-25

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-26SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2024-03-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-25HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2024-03-25HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2024-03-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2024-03-20SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-833), in concurrence.
2024-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-833) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2024-03-20SenateREAD ONCE.
2024-03-20SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2024-03-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-19HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-833).
2024-03-19HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2024-03-19HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2024-03-15JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2024-02-28JointVoted: OTP-AM
2024-02-28JointWork Session Held
2024-02-13SenateOn motion by Senator Grohoski of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
2024-02-13SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2024-02-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-02-13HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
2024-02-13HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2024-02-13HouseRepresentative PERRY for the Administrator of the unorganized territory pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 36, section 1604, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback