ME LD219 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Agricultural Marketing Loan Fund and Agricultural Development Grant
Title
An Act To Improve the Agricultural Marketing Loan Fund and Agricultural Development Grant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-587) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-587) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-587) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-587) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-890), in concurrence. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-890) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-890). |
2022-03-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-30 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-01-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 25, 2021. |