ME LD2156 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Authorize the Provision of Emergency Medical Treatment for Certain Dogs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Authorize the Provision of Emergency Medical Treatment for Certain Dogs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2024-03-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2024-03-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2024-03-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-820), in concurrence.
2024-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-820) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2024-03-14SenateREAD ONCE.
2024-03-14SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2024-03-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-820).
2024-03-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2024-03-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2024-03-12JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2024-02-14JointVoted: OTP-AM
2024-02-14JointWork Session Held
2024-01-09SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
2024-01-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-01-03HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2024-01-03HouseCommittee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback