ME LD215 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Increase the Reimbursement Rate for Ambulance Service Paid by the Department of Corrections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Increase the Reimbursement Rate for Ambulance Service Paid by the Department of Corrections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-29SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-28HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-23SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-05-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-283), in concurrence.
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-283) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-23SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-23SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-21HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-283).
2019-05-21HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-21HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-01-29HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-29HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2019-01-24SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-01-24SenateOn motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-01-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2019-01-22HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback