ME LD2141 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2024 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Enhance Protections for and Better Address Invasive Aquatic Plant Infestations in Inland Waters of the State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Enhance Protections for and Better Address Invasive Aquatic Plant Infestations in Inland Waters of the State

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-29 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #573 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2024-05-10SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2024-05-10SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-773) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-770) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2024-05-10SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-773) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-770) thereto ADOPTED
2024-05-10SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-770) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-773) READ and ADOPTED
2024-05-10SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-773) was ADOPTED
2024-05-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-773)
2024-05-10SenateOn Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2024-03-07SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2024-03-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-06HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2024-03-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2024-03-05SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-773), in concurrence.
2024-03-05SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2024-02-29SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2024-02-29SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-773) READ and ADOPTED
2024-02-29SenateREAD ONCE
2024-02-29SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 573 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2024-02-29SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2024-02-29SenateTaken from the table by the President
2024-02-28SenateUnfinished Business
2024-02-28SenateOn motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator LaFOUNTAIN of Kennebec to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. Roll Call Ordered
2024-02-28SenateSenator LaFOUNTAIN of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report in Concurrence.
2024-02-28SenateReports READ
2024-02-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-02-27HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-773).
2024-02-27HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2024-02-27HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-773) was READ and ADOPTED.
2024-02-27HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2024-02-27HouseOn motion of Representative LANDRY of Farmington, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2024-02-27HouseReports READ.
2024-02-26JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2024-02-05JointVoted: Divided Report
2024-02-05JointWork Session Held
2024-01-09SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
2024-01-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-01-03HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
2024-01-03HouseCommittee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback