ME LD2140 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Enact the Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact
Title
An Act to Enact the Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Rep. Deqa Dhalac [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Amy Kuhn [D] |
Rep. Kelly Murphy [D] | Sen. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-948) in concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-948) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-948). |
2024-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-948) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |