ME LD2126 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Making Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government, General Fund and Other Funds and Changing Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2020 and June 30, 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government, General Fund and Other Funds and Changing Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2020 and June 30, 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #374 (Y: 130 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2020-03-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-03-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 374 (Yeas 130 - Nays 5 - Absent 1 - Excused 14) - Vacant 1
2020-03-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2020-03-17HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2020-03-17SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2020-03-17SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-775), in concurrence.
2020-03-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-775) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2020-03-17SenateREAD ONCE.
2020-03-17SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2020-03-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-03-17HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-775).
2020-03-17HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2020-03-17HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2020-02-27SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2020-02-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-02-27HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
2020-02-27HouseCommittee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback