ME LD209 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Authorize an Interim Use Trail on the Berlin Subdivision Rail Corridor
Title
An Act to Authorize an Interim Use Trail on the Berlin Subdivision Rail Corridor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative WILLIAMS of Bar Harbor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/ REF TO TRA |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2023-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=209&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0130&item=1&snum=131 |