ME LD2078 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 100: Enforcement Procedures, a Major Substantive Rule of the Maine Health Data Organization
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 100: Enforcement Procedures, a Major Substantive Rule of the Maine Health Data Organization
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-03-05 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-689), in concurrence. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-689) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-25 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-689). |
2020-02-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-01-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gratwick of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Report READ and REJECTED, in concurrence. |
2020-01-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2020-01-28 | House | Report was READ and REJECTED. |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative HYMANSON for the Maine Health Data Organization pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |