ME LD2071 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Fill All Vacant and Expired Seats on the Emergency Medical Services' Board
Title
Resolve, to Fill All Vacant and Expired Seats on the Emergency Medical Services' Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-03-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-07 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2024-03-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2024-01-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2024-01-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 20, 2023 and REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed. |