ME LD2059 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Provision for Care of Infants after Birth
Title
An Act To Clarify the Provision for Care of Infants after Birth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-03-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-03-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-01-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |