ME LD2056 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Create the Frequent Users System Engagement Collaborative
Title
Resolve, To Create the Frequent Users System Engagement Collaborative
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] |
Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2020-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-23 | House | Subsequently, the Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2020-01-23 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2020-01-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-01-21 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2056&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1460&item=1&snum=129 |