ME LD2054 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Consolidate Certain Reporting Requirements of the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
An Act To Consolidate Certain Reporting Requirements of the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2020-01-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |