ME LD2048 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Authorizing Certain Land Transactions by the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Bureau of Parks and Lands
Title
Resolve, Authorizing Certain Land Transactions by the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Bureau of Parks and Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-03-05 | House | In accordance with Section 23 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2020-03-03 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-25 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-02-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-01-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-21 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |