ME LD2039 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide for Judicial Review in Compliance with the Federal Legislation Known as the Family First Prevention Services Act
Title
An Act To Provide for Judicial Review in Compliance with the Federal Legislation Known as the Family First Prevention Services Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-700), in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-700) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-700). |
2020-03-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-03-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carpenter of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-21 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |