ME LD2025 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Authorize the Bureau of Parks and Lands To Enter into a Lease with Aroostook Technologies, Inc. for a Parcel of Land in Township 11, Range 4 WELS
Title
Resolve, To Authorize the Bureau of Parks and Lands To Enter into a Lease with Aroostook Technologies, Inc. for a Parcel of Land in Township 11, Range 4 WELS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-07 | House | In accordance with Section 23 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-518). |
2022-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-518). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 16, 2022 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |