ME LD2022 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Judicial Districts and Divisions for York County
Title
An Act To Amend the Judicial Districts and Divisions for York County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-535). |
2022-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-535). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-535) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-11 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed |