ME LD202 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Implement Ranked-choice Voting
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Implement Ranked-choice Voting
Sponsors
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Valli Geiger [D] |
Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Ann Matlack [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #171 (Y: 77 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #229 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #229 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Present Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2021-06-08 | House | This being a Constitutional Amendment, in accordance with the provisions of Section 4 of Article X of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present was necessary. |
2021-06-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-172). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-172) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 171 (Yeas 77 - Nays 65 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-172) |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-172) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 229 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-26 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |