ME LD200 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Name the Bridge on Main Street in the Town of Orono the Brandon M. Silk Memorial Bridge
Title
Resolve, To Name the Bridge on Main Street in the Town of Orono the Brandon M. Silk Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2019-02-21 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-14 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-02-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2019-02-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-22 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |