ME LD1999 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Profiling and To Strengthen Civil Rights in Maine
Title
An Act To Prohibit Profiling and To Strengthen Civil Rights in Maine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-859), in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-859) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-859). |
2022-03-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-28 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-11 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |