ME LD1997 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Enhance Services Provided by the Department of Environmental Protection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Enhance Services Provided by the Department of Environmental Protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2024-03-28SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2024-03-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-27HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2024-03-25HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-25HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-594).
2024-03-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2024-03-25HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2024-03-21SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2024-03-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-594).
2024-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-594) READ and ADOPTED.
2024-03-21SenateREAD ONCE.
2024-03-21SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2024-03-20JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2024-01-26JointVoted: OTP-AM
2024-01-26JointWork Session Held
2024-01-23JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2023-07-26SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-07-25JointCarry Over Approved
2023-06-01JointCarry Over Requested
2023-05-23HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-23HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS.
2023-05-23SenateOn motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2023-05-23SenateCommittee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback