ME LD1995 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 790 Yeas 32 - Nays 2 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 790 Yeas 32 - Nays 2 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government, General Fund and Other Funds and To Change Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2022 and June 30, 2023
Title
An Act To Make Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government, General Fund and Other Funds and To Change Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2022 and June 30, 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #790 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #592 (Y: 119 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #592 (Y: 119 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 790 Yeas 32 - Nays 2 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-19 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029), in concurrence. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029). |
2022-04-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029) was ADOPTED. |
2022-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, House Amendment "C" (H-1040) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2022-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative LIBBY of Auburn, House Amendment "C" (H-1040) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029) was READ. |
2022-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, House Amendment "B" (H-1039) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2022-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Scarborough, House Amendment "B" (H-1039) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029) was READ. |
2022-04-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-1029) was READ. |
2022-04-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 592 (Yeas 119 - Nays 16 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-19 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-19 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative PIERCE of Falmouth REMOVED. |
2022-04-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-04-14 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-04-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-04-06 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-04-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-03-30 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-03-28 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-03-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-03-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-03-23 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-03-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-02-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2022-02-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 22, 2022. |