ME LD1989 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Recounts in Municipal Elections
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Recounts in Municipal Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2020-02-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-02-11 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2020-02-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-375). |
2020-02-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-375) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-375) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-01-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2020-01-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |