ME LD1982 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Consumers' Privacy by Giving Them Greater Control of Their Data and To Establish Consumer Protections Regarding Small Dollar Loans
Title
An Act To Protect Consumers' Privacy by Giving Them Greater Control of Their Data and To Establish Consumer Protections Regarding Small Dollar Loans
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-03-10 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-03-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1982&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0713&item=1&snum=130 |