ME LD198 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require That Nonmotorized Carriages Be Equipped with Reflective Tape and Lights
Title
An Act To Require That Nonmotorized Carriages Be Equipped with Reflective Tape and Lights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-243), in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-243) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-243). |
2019-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-22 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |